Board of Trustees
Chairman
Tim Lee
Evangelist
Rowlett, TX
Executive Committee Member
Audit Committee Member
(Chairmanship term expires Apr. 12, 2027)
Vice Chairman
William F. Graham, IV
Evangelist
Asheville, NC
Audit Committee Member
(Vice Chairmanship term expires Apr. 12, 2027)
Board Members
Dr. Brian Autry
Church Convention Administrator
Midlothian, VA
Budget & Finance Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
Anthony Beckles
Education Administrator
Lynchburg, VA
Facilities & Campus Development Committee Chairman
Investment Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
Gaye Overton Benson
Businesswoman
Chesapeake, VA
Budget & Finance Committee Chairwoman
Spiritual Mission Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
Jeffrey F. Benson
Businessman
Chesapeake, VA
Investment Committee Chairman
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
Dr. John Borek
President Emeritus
Higher Education Consultant
John Creek, GA
Audit Committee Member
Academic and Student Affairs Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 27, 2026)
Dr. Dondi Costin
President
Lynchburg, VA
Executive Committee Member
(Ex officio)
Dr. Don Crain
Pastor, Retired
Mechanicsville, VA
Budget & Finance Committee Member
Facilities & Campus Development Committee Member
(Term expires Nov. 5, 2024)
Dr. Jack Dinsbeer
Pastor, Retired
Jacksonville, FL
Academic and Student Affairs Committee Member
Emeritus Trustee
(Lifetime Term)
Jonathan Falwell
Chancellor
Pastor, Thomas Road Baptist Church
Lynchburg, VA
Spiritual Mission Committee Chairman
Executive Committee Member
(Ex officio)
Jack Graham
Senior Pastor
Audit Committee
Plano, TX
(Term expires Oct. 27, 2026)
William F. Graham, IV
Evangelist
Asheville, NC
Audit Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
John Heath
Businessman, Retired
Roanoke, VA
Audit Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 27, 2026)
Carroll Hudson
Businessman
Lynchburg, VA
Executive Committee Chairman
Budget & Finance Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 27, 2026)
Angela Jordan
Businesswoman
Grand Rapids, MI
Academic and Student Affairs Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
Dr. Richard Lee
Pastor
Cumming, GA
Academic and Student Affairs Committee Member
Investment Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
Tim Lee
Evangelist
Rowlett, TX
Executive Committee Member
Audit Committee Member
(Term expires Nov. 5, 2024)
Dr. Allen McFarland
Pastor
Chesapeake, VA
Spiritual Mission Committee Member
(Term expires Nov. 5, 2024)
Dr. Gene Mims
Pastor
Brentwood, TN
Academic and Student Affairs Committee Chairman
Audit Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
Penny Nance
Public Policy Advocacy Executive
Alexandria, VA
Budget & Finance Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 27, 2026)
Richard Osborne
Businessman, Retired
Oxford, MD
Audit Committee Chairman
(Term expires Nov. 5, 2024)
Galen E. Peel, Sr.
Businessman
Forest, VA
Facilities & Campus Development Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
Dr. Jerry Prevo
President Emeritus
Pastor, Retired
Anchorage, AK
Executive Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
Dr. Harold Rawlings
Evangelist
Walton, KY
Facilities & Campus Development Committee Member
(Term expires Nov. 5, 2024)
Dr. Dwight “Ike” Reighard
Pastor
Powder Springs, GA
Audit Committee Member
Spiritual Mission Committee Member
(Term expires Nov. 5, 2024)
Chris Rhodenhizer
Pastor
Dumfries, VA
Spiritual Mission Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
Dr. David Rhodenhizer
Pastor
Alexandria, VA
Executive Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 27, 2026)
Gilbert “Gib” Tinney
Businessman
Budget & Finance Committee
Belmont, MI
(Term expires Oct. 27, 2026)
Will Tinney
Businessman
Rockford, MI
Investment Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
Dr. Jerry Vines
Pastor
Canton, GA
Executive Committee Member
Spiritual Mission Committee Member
(Term expires Oct. 28, 2025)
Jeffrey S. Yager
Businessman
Fort Mill, SC
Investment Committee Member
(Term expires Nov. 5, 2024)
Board of Trustees Committees
Committee Leadership, Membership, and Staff Liaisons
Executive Committee
Carroll Hudson – Chairman
President Dondi Costin
Chancellor Jonathan Falwell
Tim Lee
Dr. Jerry Prevo
Dr. David Rhodenhizer
Dr. Jerry Vines
David Corry (LU General Counsel)
Investment Committee
Jeffrey F. Benson – Chairman
Anthony Beckles
Dr. Dwight “Ike” Reighard
Will Tinney
Jeffrey S. Yager
Dr. Rob Ritz (LU Liaison)
Academic and Student Affairs Committee
Dr. Gene Mims – Chairman
Dr. John Borek
Dr. Jack Dinsbeer
Angela Jordan
Dr. Richard Lee
Dr. David Rhodenhizer
Dr. Scott Hicks (LU Liaison)
Dr. Mark Hine (LU Liaison)
Budget & Finance Committee
Gaye Overton Benson – Chairwoman
Dr. Brian Autry
Dr. Don Crain
Carroll Hudson
Gilbert “Gib” Tinney
Dr. Rob Ritz (LU Liaison)
Spiritual Mission Committee
Chancellor Jonathan Falwell – Chairman
Gaye Overton Benson
Dr. Allen McFarland
Penny Nance
Chris Rhodenhizer
Dr. Jerry Vines
Joshua Rutledge (LU Liaison)
Audit Committee
Richard Osborne – Chairman
Dr. John Borek
Dr. Jack Graham
Will Graham
John Heath
Tim Lee
Dr. Gene Mims
Dr. Dwight “Ike” Reighard
Cindy Gaebe (LU Liaison)
Facilities & Campus Development Committee
Anthony Beckles – Chairman
President Dondi Costin
Dr. Don Crain
Galen E. Peel, Sr.
Dr. Harold Rawlings
Will Tinney
Dan Deter (LU Liaison)